MD SB1099 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission to Restore Trust in Policing to review the operation of the Baltimore Police Department's Gun Trace Task Force and make recommendations on the reorganization of the Police Department and certain other matters as necessary; authorizing the Commission to conduct hearings, administer oaths, issue process to compel a witness to appear, and require a person to testify; requiring the Commission to submit a final report of its findings by December 31, 2019, to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing and Audit Review
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {214436/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Attorneys
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Emergency Bills
General Assembly
Law Enforcement
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Sunset
Time
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Emergency Bills
General Assembly
Law Enforcement
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Sunset
Time