MD SB1098 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the tax collector in Baltimore City from selling residential property when the tax in arrears consists only of unpaid charges for water and sewer service; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service if the property is being sold to enforce another lien; requiring the Baltimore City Department of Public Works to report to the members of the Baltimore City delegation to the General Assembly by October 1, 2019, on certain matters; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] |
Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (138-1) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {695769/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {673320/1 (Senator Robinson) Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {989230/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Liens
Property Tax
Public Works
Real Property
Reports
Sewage
Sunset
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Water
Liens
Property Tax
Public Works
Real Property
Reports
Sewage
Sunset
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Water