MD SB1098 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a specified services agreement between a credit card processor and a business entity from including a specified provision authorizing liquidated damages or specifying a fee for the termination of a services agreement that exceeds $99; prohibiting a credit card processor who has received a specified termination notice from debiting or accessing the bank account of a specified business entity after a specified period of time; authorizing the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to take specified actions; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Contracts
Credit
Fees
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Contracts
Credit
Fees
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Notices
Penalties and Sentences