MD SB1095 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Senators Frosh, Raskin, and Shank
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Senators Frosh, Raskin, and Shank
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified definition for purposes of specified provisions of law prohibiting nonjudicial actions to take possession of property; repealing specified provisions of law providing that the establishment of a lien is the remedy for nonpayment of a ground rent on specified residential property; altering the manner of giving specified notice; authorizing the holder of a ground rent in arrears to be reimbursed for specified expenses under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senators Frosh, Raskin, and Shank |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {110012/5 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Environmental Matters |
2014-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Frosh) {293623/1 Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {818573/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {818573/1 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Frosh) Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Contracts
Court Costs
Emergency Bills
Eviction
Fees
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Liens
Notices
Process Serving
Real Estate
Real Property
Civil Actions
Contracts
Court Costs
Emergency Bills
Eviction
Fees
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Liens
Notices
Process Serving
Real Estate
Real Property