MD SB1090 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the formula used to apportion certain income to the State for certain corporations that carry on a trade or business within and outside the State; authorizing certain corporations to elect to use a certain formula to apportion certain income; requiring certain corporations to apportion certain income from certain intangible investments in a certain manner; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-6) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {703227/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-81) (Y: 51 N: 82 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (47-84) (Y: 48 N: 85 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {703227/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (53-76) (Y: 54 N: 77 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-44) (Y: 89 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {863828/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (65-67) (Y: 66 N: 68 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {703227/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-81) (Y: 51 N: 82 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (47-84) (Y: 48 N: 85 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {703227/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (53-76) (Y: 54 N: 77 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-44) (Y: 89 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {863828/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (65-67) (Y: 66 N: 68 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-6) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (88-44) |
2018-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {703227/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (53-76) |
2018-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {703227/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-81) |
2018-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (47-84) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment {863828/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (65-67) |
2018-04-05 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {175661/1 Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {795360/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-5) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {409330/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Corporations
Federal Government
Foreign Trade
Income Tax
Interstate Affairs
Public Service Commission
Reports
Taxes - Income
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Federal Government
Foreign Trade
Income Tax
Interstate Affairs
Public Service Commission
Reports
Taxes - Income
Telecommunications and Information Technology