MD SB109 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Merging the Address Confidentiality Program and the Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program into a single Address Confidentiality Program administered by the Secretary of State; expanding certain eligibility requirements for the Address Confidentiality Program to include certain individuals; repealing the requirement that a request by a Program participant to withdraw from the Address Confidentiality Program be notarized; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124
2021-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2021-04-07HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-07HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-01-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-01-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-01-26SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-01-26SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-01-04SenateHearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
2021-01-04SenateHearing canceled
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-09-26SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4513(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4519(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4520(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4521(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4522(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4523(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4524(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4525(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4526(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4527(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4528(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4529(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4530(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4531(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property3114(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government7301(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government7302(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government7303(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government7304(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government7307(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback