MD SB109 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State, a county, or a municipal corporation to pay a certain refund to a disabled active duty service member, disabled veteran, or surviving spouse under certain circumstances; requiring the State, a county, or a municipal corporation to pay interest on the refund under certain circumstances; and applying the Act retroactively to be applied to and interpreted to affect all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Exemption – Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses – Refund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {919636/1 Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-01-14SenateHearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-14SenateHearing canceled
2020-01-06SenateHearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-10-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1109 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government16108(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government16108.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property1306(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property7208(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback