MD SB109 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law allowing a surviving parent to inherit certain intestate property if there is a surviving spouse but no surviving issue; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Pre-filed |