MD SB1084 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Continuing the CORE Partnership Fund to assist the Department of Housing and Community Development, in conjunction with the Maryland Stadium Authority and Baltimore City, in expeditiously removing blighted property within Baltimore City; requiring the Secretary to administer the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; authorizing the Governor to include an appropriation of $30,000,000 in the annual budget bill for the Fund for fiscal year 2020 and $25,000,000 for the Fund in fiscal years 2021 through 2024; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {854534/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Comptroller
Economic and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Stadium Authority
Sunset
Treasurers
Urban Renewal
Baltimore City
Comptroller
Economic and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Stadium Authority
Sunset
Treasurers
Urban Renewal