MD SB1081 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amending certain prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that certain grantees provide certain matching funds; extending the deadline for certain grantees to present certain evidence that a matching fund will be presented; extending the termination date of certain grants; changing the locations of certain capital projects; altering the purposes of certain grants; changing the names of certain grantees; altering the authorized uses of certain grants; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-03-17HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {739132/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-11SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-11SenateMotion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted
2020-03-11SenateMotion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted
2020-03-06SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2013(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2014(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2015(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2016(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2017(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2018(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2019(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback