MD SB1080 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Governor to take certain actions as a result of the issuance by the Governor on March 5, 2020, of the proclamation declaring a state of emergency for the duration of a certain emergency; providing that a certain alternative workweek may allow an employee to work certain hours or shifts; requiring that an employee authorized to work an alternative workweek is considered a full-time employee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 13
2020-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (123-6)
2020-03-17HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (126-5)
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {956688/1 Adopted
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-16HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15SenateFloor Amendment {863722/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2020-03-15SenateMotion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14SenateFloor Amendment {153922/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFloor Committee Amendment {117171/1 Adopted
2020-03-14SenateMotion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2020-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {937874/1 Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-10SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-09SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-09SenateMotion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Lam) Adopted
2020-03-09SenateMotion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Lam) Adopted
2020-03-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1663 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1080?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1080f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1080t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1080e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/Chapters_noln/CH_13_sb1080e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1080_93787401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1080_11717101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1080_15392201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1080_86372201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1080_95668801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb1080_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb1080_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0777.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1038.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1039.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/1021.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback