MD SB1079 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing the Governor to transfer by budget amendment up to $50,000,000 from the Revenue Stabilization Account to fund costs associated with the Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19); requiring the Governor to provide the Legislative Policy Committee with at least 7 days for review before transferring the funds; requiring, within 60 days of the release of funds, the Department of Budget and Management to submit a report to the Legislative Policy Committee and the General Assembly on the use of the funds per unit of State government; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 12
2020-03-09SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-03-06HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-03-06HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-06SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
2020-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {399537/1 Adopted
2020-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-04SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-04SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-04SenateMotion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator King) Adopted
2020-03-04SenateMotion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator King) Adopted
2020-03-01SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1661 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Referred Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback