MD SB1078 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $300 to $600, the annual license fee for a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license in Washington County.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor - License Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-6) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Washington County