MD SB1068 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "unfair or deceptive trade practice" to be "unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice"; providing that the purpose of the Act is to support enforcement by and funding of the Office of the Attorney General and the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to protect State residents when conducting financial transactions and receiving financial services; requiring the Commissioner to designate a Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the establishment of a student loan borrower education course; etc.
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-12) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-42) (Y: 90 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-12) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-42) (Y: 90 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-12) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-12) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (89-42) |
2018-04-06 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Waldstreicher) Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {933193/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-12) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {717373/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {717373/1 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Accountants
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Armed Forces
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Bankruptcy
Bonds
Budgets
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Claims
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Corporations
Court of Appeals
Criminal Background Investigations
Data
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Governor
Hearings
Higher Education
Interest
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Notaries Public
Notices
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Prices
Public Officials
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Securities
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Armed Forces
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Bankruptcy
Bonds
Budgets
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Claims
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Corporations
Court of Appeals
Criminal Background Investigations
Data
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Governor
Hearings
Higher Education
Interest
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Notaries Public
Notices
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Prices
Public Officials
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Securities
Time
Work, Labor and Employment