MD SB1067 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, the State Department of Education, the Department of Housing and Community Development, and the Department of General Services, to adopt certain regulations on or before June 1, 2022, establishing uniform standards for mold assessment and remediation; requiring the Department of the Environment to submit a certain annual indoor air quality report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1 beginning in 2023; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1540 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education5401(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61601(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61602(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8211.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback