MD SB1065 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to appropriate certain amounts of money to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in fiscal years 2022 through 2026; requiring the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra to submit certain reports to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before October 15 each year, beginning in 2022 and for the next 4 years; and repealing the termination of a certain provision of law requiring the Governor to appropriate a certain amount of money to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in fiscal years 2020 and 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development - Baltimore Symphony Orchestra - Funding and Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (103-29)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-03-15HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (42-3)
2020-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-13SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-03SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2020-02-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1658 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2019(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development4513(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback