MD SB1064 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Approving certain projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of certain academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; approving the issuance of bonds by the University System of Maryland in a total principal amount of $7,000,000 for financing the projects; providing that the bonds issued under the authority of the Act are not a debt or an obligation of the State or any of its subdivisions; etc.
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-22 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {169030/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Bonds
Capital Budget
Higher Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Universities and Colleges
Bonds
Capital Budget
Higher Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Universities and Colleges