MD SB1063 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Secretary of Health to authorize an employee of a State facility to work according to an "alternative workweek", which means a work schedule under which a certain employee works atypical shifts and may work less than 40 hours in a week; requiring that a certain employee be considered a full-time employee of the State; providing that certain provisions of law governing the payment for overtime work apply to employees of a State facility who are authorized to work according to a certain alternative workweek; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-10SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Finance
2020-02-27SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1646 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General2104(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions8305(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback