MD SB1056 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing provisions of law governing the rental of personal motor vehicles to other persons in a specified manner; establishing that specified persons may rent only specified classes of personal motor vehicles to other persons; prohibiting a renter of a personal motor vehicle from using the motor vehicle for specified purposes; prohibiting a person from renting a personal motor vehicle to another person unless the motor vehicle is covered by specified security; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Disclosure
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Records
Residency
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Records
Residency
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous