MD SB1054 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations governing the use of bowfishing gear; establishing a commercial northern snakehead bowfishing license; authorizing a licensee to catch for sale northern snakeheads in the tidal waters of the State using a bow and arrow attached to a retrieval line; prohibiting a licensee from fishing under the license under specified circumstances; establishing a specified application process for the license; establishing an annual fee of $15 for the license; etc.
Title
Commercial Northern Snakehead Bowfishing License - Establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-1) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 708 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-1) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {224935/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Dealers
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Weapons
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Weapons