MD SB1053 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Baltimore County Hub and Spoke Pilot Program to offer and provide addiction treatment on demand through a model that offers ongoing opioid use disorder treatment integrated with general health and wellness services; requiring the Baltimore County Department of Health, in consultation with the Behavioral Health Administration in the Maryland Department of Health and certain stakeholders, to develop and implement the Program in a certain manner; requiring a report on the Pilot Program's results by October 1, 2023: etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {397574/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-27SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24SenateRereferred to Finance
2020-02-21SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB611 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General134101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134102(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134103(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134104(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134105(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback