MD SB1053 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit in an amount not to exceed the lesser of $2,500 per dwelling or the amount of property tax imposed on the dwelling for certain 9-1-1 public safety telecommunicators in the county or municipal corporation where the individuals reside; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {125364/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2018-04-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {949730/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Counties
Death
Emergencies
Higher Education
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Public Employees
Public Safety
Safety
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Counties
Death
Emergencies
Higher Education
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Public Employees
Public Safety
Safety
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time