MD SB1052 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a certain exception authorizing, under certain circumstances, a student who is a registered sex offender to enter onto real property used for public or nonpublic elementary or secondary education; requiring a county board of education to adopt a policy that enables a student who is a registered sex offender to continue receiving a certain education in a location other than real property used for certain educational purposes; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt guidelines and a model policy; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Entry Onto School Property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {648976/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-25SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-21SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1638 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure11722(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback