MD SB1051 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Interjurisdictional Policing Grant Program to provide counties with grants to defray costs associated with establishing and supporting interjurisdictional policing agreements; requiring the Governor, in each fiscal year, to provide $3,500,000 in the annual budget bill; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Program and establish certain requirements for the Program; specifying certain details regarding application procedures and grant awards; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Interjurisdictional Policing Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1355 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Electronic Government
Governor
Grants
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
Budgets
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Electronic Government
Governor
Grants
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 4 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1051?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1051f.pdf |