MD SB1050 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering penalties applicable to failing to report a lost or stolen regulated firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm - Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {238878/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-04SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-21SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB591 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety5146(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback