MD SB105 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "nonprofit training entity" for the purposes of the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program to include an entity that uses trained therapy horses for interaction with veterans; altering the definition of "eligible veteran" to include veterans who receive treatment or care from a U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs or U.S. Department of Defense medical facility in the State; altering the duties of a nonprofit training entity selected under the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465
2019-03-26SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-02-07SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {954535/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-18SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-18SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-16SenateHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback