MD SB1047 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to study and identify certain information relating to certain firearm crimes, injuries, fatalities, and crime firearms; requiring all State and local law enforcement agencies and other governmental units to provide the Office of the Attorney General with any and all information necessary to complete the study; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2020, December 1, 2021, and December 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of the Attorney General – Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms – Study

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment {618474/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {618474/1
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-25SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-20SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1629 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback