MD SB1046 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City, on or before July 1, 2022, to issue a Class B-D-7 license for premises located in a certain area if the license applicant enters into a memorandum of understanding with the Charles North Community Organization; and authorizing the Board to make issuance or renewal of a certain license conditional on the substantial compliance of applicants entered into a certain memorandum of understanding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-10SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-09SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-26SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-20SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121406(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121603(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback