MD SB1045 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the terms of a certain grant or contract allow for reimbursement of indirect costs at the same rate the nonprofit organization has negotiated and received for indirect costs under a direct federal award or negotiated and received from a nonfederal entity based on certain cost principles or, under certain circumstances, at a rate of at least a certain percent of certain costs; and applying the Act.
Title
State Government - Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Indirect Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 734 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {124538/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Contracts
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Reimbursement Rates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Reimbursement Rates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement