MD SB1043 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish certain new units to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, in each of fiscal years 2022 through 2031, to include in the annual State operating budget $57,700,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; specifying the purpose and uses of the Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2020-02-24SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-19SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1260 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education10214(n/a)See Bill Text
Education11206.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Education15126(n/a)See Bill Text
Education15127(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback