MD SB1040 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing to 3.5% the maximum rate a county may impose on an individual's Maryland taxable income for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021; requiring a county, with regard to any increase to its county income tax rate that is effective on or after January 1, 2022, to impose the increase on an income bracket basis; requiring a county that imposes the county income tax on an income bracket basis to set, by ordinance or resolution, certain income brackets; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2020-02-17SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1494 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback