MD SB104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the items that are required to be included with a financial statement submitted to the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight to allow, at the election of the business, an existing business in operation for 5 or more years to submit federal tax returns filed by the business for the prior year instead of a certain financial stability statement.
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Records
Tax Returns
Time
Cemeteries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Records
Tax Returns
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 5 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |