MD SB1039 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to delegate to any Maryland Insurance Administration employee, rather than only one, who is designated by the Commissioner and admitted to the practice of law in the State the responsibility for holding certain hearings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Hearings - Authority to Delegate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-02SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24SenateRereferred to Finance
2020-02-17SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1593 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-02 - Rereferred to Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance2210(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback