MD SB1038 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Secretary of Transportation to determine that a vehicle or combination of vehicles transporting certain freight is an indivisible load authorized to obtain a certain overweight vehicle permit under certain circumstances; establishing certain conditions for a vehicle issued a permit under the Act, including a requirement to travel only on roads designated as being part of a "heavy weight port corridor"; establishing a certain maximum gross vehicle weight for a vehicle with a certain permit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 255
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {540913/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {868779/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-05SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1038&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1038f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1038t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1038e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_255_sb1038e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb1038_86877901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb1038_54091301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb1038.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb1038_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0776.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb1038_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1348.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1250.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback