MD SB1036 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office within the Maryland Emergency Management Agency (MEMA) to help improve statewide cybersecurity readiness and response; requiring the Director of MEMA to appoint an Executive Director as head of the Office; requiring the Office to be provided with sufficient staff to perform the Office's functions; requiring the Office to establish regional assistance groups to deliver or coordinate support services to political subdivisions, agencies, or regions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-04SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-17SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1618 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-19 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety14101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14104.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback