MD SB1033 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study the Feasibility of a Bowie State University Law School; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to make certain recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study the Feasibility of a Bowie State University Law School

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-17SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1621 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-20 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback