MD SB1033 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Feasibility of a Bowie State University Law School; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to make certain recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of a Bowie State University Law School
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Melony Griffith [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] |
Sen. Obie Patterson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1621 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-20 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Attorneys
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Examinations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Prince George's County
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Examinations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Prince George's County
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1033?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1033f.pdf |