MD SB1033 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to develop a Military Health Care Provider Transition Plan; providing for the purpose of the Plan; requiring the Department to work in conjunction with specified entities; requiring the Plan to include specified goals; requiring the Department to address the concerns and recommendations identified in a specified report; requiring the Department to complete the Plan by a specified date; requiring the Department to submit specified reports to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Veterans Affairs - Military Health Care Provider Transition Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-08 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-08 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-01 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-25 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-25 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Higher Education Commission
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Education
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Higher Education Commission
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment