MD SB1032 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the date to January 31, 2021, by which the Institute for Urban Research at Morgan State University must submit a full report on the activities, findings, and recommendations of the Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity to the Governor and the General Assembly; and extending the termination date to May 31, 2021, for certain provisions of law relating to the Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity - Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback