MD SB1031 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Central Payroll Bureau of the Office of the State Comptroller to establish specified pay periods and pay each employee all wages due at least once every 2 weeks or twice a month; requiring each appointing authority to calculate and report specified payroll information to the Central Payroll Bureau; requiring each appointing authority to provide to each employee a notice of specified information; requiring the Bureau to provide each employee a statement, each pay period, that includes specified information; etc.
Title
Payroll Recovery Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Special Order until next session (Senator Miller) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Brochin) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {497074/1 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Comptroller
Damages
Governor
Notices
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Damages
Governor
Notices
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor and Employment