MD SB103 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain requirements for the licensing and regulation of audiologists, hearing aid dispensers, speech-language pathologists, and music therapists, including clarifying quorum requirements for the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists, license reciprocity, professional disciplinary grounds, and delegation authority for audiologists.
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 123727/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 123727/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Floor Amendment {123727/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (38-94) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB155 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Discipline
Ethics
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Licenses
Rehabilitation
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Discipline
Ethics
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Licenses
Rehabilitation
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 205.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 4A-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 4A-21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |