MD SB1029 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that a record relating to a formal complaint of job-related misconduct made against a law enforcement officer is not a personnel record under certain provisions of the Public Information Act under certain circumstances; authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of certain records involving a complaint of job-related misconduct made against a law enforcement officer; authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of certain records by a complainant only under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateHearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-24SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1221 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions4101(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4311(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4351(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback