MD SB1028 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution authorizing the General Assembly to increase or add Executive Department items in the budget bill, provided that the total of the appropriation for the Executive Department approved by the General Assembly does not exceed the total proposed appropriation for the Executive Department submitted by the Governor; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State at the next general election to be held in November 2020 for adoption or rejection; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Balancing the State Budget

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Floor Amendment 403426/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-18 - House - Floor Amendment 763328/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 645
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (95-39)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (97-38)
2020-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFloor Amendment {403426/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-95)
2020-03-18HouseFloor Amendment {763328/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-97)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Laid Over (Delegate Kipke) Withdrawn
2020-03-18HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
2020-03-18HouseMotion Laid Over (Delegate Kipke)
2020-03-18HouseFloor Amendment {763328/1 (Delegate Kipke)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-03-17HouseHearing 3/18 at 9:30 a.m.
2020-03-17HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (30-15)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFloor Amendment {319238/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {289032/1 Adopted
2020-03-16SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {289032/1
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-18SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2020-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
II - Executive Department17(n/a)See Bill Text
III - Legislative Department14(n/a)See Bill Text
III - Legislative Department52(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1028?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1028f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1028t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0008/sb1028_28903201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0008/sb1028_31923801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0008/sb1028_76332801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0008/sb1028_40342601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb1028_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0910.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1219.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1220.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1221.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1222.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback