MD SB1028 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing in Baltimore County that Class B or Class D alcoholic beverages licenses transferred under specified provisions of law relating to alcoholic beverages in certain areas of Baltimore County be added to specified totals of transferred licenses that are computed for the purpose of determining whether the number of licenses in existence in election district 15 is not greater than 25% more than the number of those licenses that would otherwise exist in that district.
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-02 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2013-03-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of