MD SB1025 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force on Fishing License Penalties to study fishing license penalty reciprocity between Maryland and the Potomac River Fisheries Commission, and, if Virginia participates, between Virginia and the Potomac River Fisheries Commission; requiring the Governor to make certain requests regarding the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and make recommendations by December 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on Fishing License Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-16HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-15HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {154333/1 Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-04SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-13SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback