MD SB1024 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Home Energy Programs, in coordination with the United Way of Central Maryland and the Fuel Fund of Maryland, to establish the Power to the People Pilot Program on or before July 1, 2021, to expand access to the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the Pilot Program to provide training for certain individuals in the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the United Way of Central Maryland to develop a certain screening intake process; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {627777/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-24SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateRereferred to Finance
2020-02-13SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB938 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed 45-0

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Human Services55A-08(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback