MD SB1022 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to grant a tuition waiver, in an amount not to exceed the amount of the tuition obligation, to a student member of the Board serving in the second year of a two-year term; prohibiting the tuition waiver from being considered a gift or compensation under certain State laws; prohibiting a student member receiving the tuition waiver from being classified as an employee of the University System of Maryland; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland – Tuition Waiver – Student Members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (126-5)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (125-7)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-03-15HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {873028/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-18SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2020-02-13SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education12102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback