MD SB1019 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on real property that is located in a Rural Legacy Area and for which the property owner has sold certain development rights under the Rural Legacy Program; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Rural Legacy Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-02-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback