MD SB1017 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to maintain an adequate and accessible pharmacy benefits manager network consisting of contracted pharmacies that provide convenient patient access to pharmacy services; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt certain regulations; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from requiring a certain pharmacy or pharmacist to obtain certain accreditation, certification, or credentialing as a condition for participating in a certain network; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2020-02-12SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1307 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance151611.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance151628(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance151628.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance151628.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback