MD SB1016 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that participation by certain organizations in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program may not impede, undermine, or conflict with certain obligations or statuses; establishing the Task Force to Study Cooperative Purchasing for Health Insurance; requiring the Task Force to report its recommendations on ways to control health costs and offer a variety of health benefit plan choices to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-13) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment {613725/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {887276/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties
Education, Boards of
Federal Government
Health Insurance
Insurance Administration
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties
Education, Boards of
Federal Government
Health Insurance
Insurance Administration
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Sunset